Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 10/04/2023 | Filed |