Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0104 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024