Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/17/24, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 12/05/23, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|