Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0106 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis December 5, 2023
Analysis December 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill January 19, 2024