Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0158 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 10, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024