Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1161
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 1161
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
CS/CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/08/24, 10:45 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Finance and Tax
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|