Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0172 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 11, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 12, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024