Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 725
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Substituted HB 725
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/31/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 01/11/24, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 11/14/23, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|