Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0174 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 11, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis November 14, 2023
Analysis November 13, 2023