|
05/13/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-165
|
|
|
|
05/10/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/25/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/31/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 01/11/24, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/05/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|