Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0186 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis December 6, 2023
Analysis December 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill December 6, 2023