Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 141
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 141
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 01/11/24, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 12/05/23, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|