Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0196 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 12, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis December 5, 2023
Analysis December 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill January 16, 2024