Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 217
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 217
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Education read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 01/24/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
CS by Education Postsecondary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
CS by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 01/09/24, 4:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred to Education Postsecondary; Appropriations Committee on Education; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|