Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0222 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 18, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 26, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024