Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0222 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 02/14/2024

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Appropriations  
 
BILL: CS/CS/SB 222 
INTRODUCER:  Appropriations Committee on Education Committee; Education Postsecondary 
Committee; and Senator Rodriguez 
SUBJECT:  College Campus Facilities in Areas of Critical State Concern 
DATE: February 14, 2024 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Jahnke Bouck HE Fav/CS 
2. Gray Elwell AED  Fav/CS 
3. Gray Sadberry AP Pre-meeting 
 
Please see Section IX. for Additional Information: 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE - Substantial Changes 
 
I. Summary: 
CS/CS/SB 222 provides that additional beds for healthcare workers may be included in the 
construction of dormitories on the campus of a Florida College System (FCS) institution, and 
revises the number of beds that may be provided in such dormitories for employees, educators, 
healthcare workers, and first responders. Additionally, the bill authorizes certain funds to be used 
to construct or maintain dormitories. 
 
This bill has no fiscal impact. See fiscal, section V. 
 
The bill is effective July 1, 2024. 
II. Present Situation: 
Florida College System Dormitory Facilities 
A Florida College System (FCS) institution or its direct-support organization has limited 
authority to plan and construct facilities and to acquire additional property.
1
 Residency 
opportunities within the FCS are predominantly off campus and provided through a third party, 
often for specific student populations such as international students, student-athletes, or specific 
                                                
1
 Section 1013.40, F.S. 
REVISED:   BILL: CS/CS/SB 222   	Page 2 
 
scholarship recipients.
2
 FCS institutions were developed as commuter schools. With 28 
institutions and multiple campuses all over the state, colleges were located so students would 
drive no further than 50 miles to be able to attend college.
3
 Historically, two colleges have 
institution-owned dormitories, Chipola College and Florida Gateway College, which were started 
in facilities that originally housed World War II bases for servicemen. Chipola College continues 
to operate a college-owned dormitory for athletes only. Florida Gateway College allows any 
student to apply for their limited number of beds.
4
 
 
An FCS institution campus within a municipality designated as an area of critical state concern,
5
 
which meets planning and development requirements, may construct dormitories for up to 340 
beds for FCS institution students and an additional 25 beds for employees, educators, and first 
responders. Such dormitories are exempt from the building permit allocation system and may be 
constructed up to 60 feet in height if the dormitories are otherwise consistent with the 
comprehensive plan, the FCS institution has a hurricane evacuation plan that requires all 
dormitory occupants to be evacuated 48 hours in advance of tropical force winds, and 
transportation is provided for dormitory occupants during an evacuation.
6
 
 
In 2008, the College of the Florida Keys (CFK) was granted legislative authority to build a 
dormitory facility with 100 beds, which was subsequently constructed and opened in 2011. 
Although there has been no further construction of student housing at CFK, the authorized 
number of beds has increased to 365, and there are restrictions regarding bonding and the 
revenues CFK can use for construction, debt service payments, maintenance and operation of 
dorm facilities. CFK is the only college within a municipality designated as an area of critical 
state concern that meets the requirements specified in law.
7
 
 
Other colleges can provide student housing only through their foundations. A direct-support 
organization may, at the request of the board of trustees, provide residency opportunities on or 
near campus for students.
8
 
 
State funds and tuition and fee revenues may not be used for construction, debt service 
payments, maintenance, or operation of such dormitories. Additional dormitory beds constructed 
after July 1, 2016, may not be financed through the issuance of bonds. However, nonpublic 
                                                
2
 Florida College System, Student Housing in the Florida College System, available at 
http://www.fldoe.org/core/fileparse.php/7480/urlt/0082726-faqhousing.pdf (last visited Jan. 16, 2024).  
3
 Email, Florida Department of Education, Division of Florida Colleges (Nov. 20, 2023), with attachment (on file with the 
Senate Committee on Higher Education). 
4
 Email, Florida Department of Education, Division of Florida Colleges (Nov. 20, 2023)., (on file with the Senate Committee 
on Higher Education). 
5
 Section 380.05, F.S. The Areas of Critical State Concern Program was created by the "Florida Environmental Land and 
Water Management Act of 1972." The program is intended to protect resources and public facilities of major statewide 
significance, within designated geographic areas, from uncontrolled development that would cause substantial deterioration 
of such resources. The designated Areas of Critical State Concern are the Apalachicola Bay Area, the Green Swamp Area, 
the Big Cypress Area, the Florida Keys Area, and the City of Key West Area. 
6
 Section 1013.40(4), F.S. 
7
 Id., F.S. Email, Florida Department of Education, Division of Florida Colleges (Nov. 20, 2023) (on file with Senate 
Committee on Higher Education). 
8
 Section 1004.70(4), F.S.  BILL: CS/CS/SB 222   	Page 3 
 
entities may issue bonds as part of a public-private partnership between the college and a 
nonpublic entity.
9
 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
This bill amends s. 1013.40, F.S., to provide that beds for healthcare workers may be included in 
the additional beds authorized for employees, educators, and first responders in the construction 
of dormitories on the campus of a Florida College System (FCS) institution. The bill also revises 
from 25 to 50 the number of dormitory beds that may be provided for such individuals.  
 
The bill authorizes state grant funds and capital improvement fee revenues to be used for the 
construction, debt service payments, maintenance, or operation of dormitories.  
 
The bill is effective July 1, 2024. 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
None. 
                                                
9
 Section 1013.40(4), F.S.  BILL: CS/CS/SB 222   	Page 4 
 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
None. 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill substantially amends section 1013.40 of the Florida Statutes. 
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Substantial Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Education on January 24, 2024: 
The committee substitute retains the provisions in the bill regarding dormitory beds and 
makes the following modifications: 
 Retains current law requiring all Florida College System dormitory occupants to be 
evacuated 48 hours in advance from tropical force winds. 
 The amendment also provides a cross-reference to clarify the allowance of certain 
fees that can be used for construction and maintenance of dormitories. 
 
CS by Education Postsecondary on January 9, 2023: 
The committee substitute retains the provisions in the bill regarding dormitory beds and 
makes the following modifications: 
 Revises a Florida College System institution’s hurricane evacuation plan to require all 
dormitory occupants to be evacuated 48 hours in advance from hurricane-force winds 
rather than tropical storm-force winds. 
 Authorizes state grant funds and capital improvement fees to be used for the 
construction and maintenance of dormitories. 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.