Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0224 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 18, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2024
Bill January 23, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024