|
04/02/2024
|
Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/18/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/10/24, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 3 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 12/06/23, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|