Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0226 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 18, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024
Analysis December 6, 2023
Analysis December 5, 2023