House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Messages | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/24 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 01/17/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Filed |