Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0240 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 19, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024