The Florida Senate BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT (This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Education Pre-K -12 BILL: SB 240 INTRODUCER: Senator Burton SUBJECT: International Baccalaureate Teacher Bonuses DATE: January 9, 2024 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR REFERENCE ACTION 1. Palazesi Bouck ED Pre-meeting 2. AED 3. AP I. Summary: SB 240 authorizes the Department of Education to determine equivalent scores for International Baccalaureate (IB) assessments that qualify for additional full-time equivalent funding and for certain school, district, and teacher bonuses based on IB exams. The bill is effective July 1, 2024. II. Present Situation: International Baccalaureate Organization Established in 1968, the International Baccalaureate (IB) programme is designed to develop well-rounded individuals who can respond to today’s challenges. 1 As of November 2023, IB programmes were being offered at over 5,700 schools in 160 countries to more than 1.95 million students. 2 The IB programme consist of four different programmes: 3 Primary Years Programme; Middle Years Programme; Career-related Programme; and Diploma Progamme. 1 International Baccalaureate, About the IB, https://www.ibo.org/about-the-ib/, (last visited Jan. 3, 2023). 2 International Baccalaureate, Facts and Figures, https://www.ibo.org/about-the-ib/facts-and-figures/, (last visited Jan. 3, 2023). 3 International Baccalaureate, Programme, https://www.ibo.org/programmes/, (last visited Jan. 3, 2023). REVISED: BILL: SB 240 Page 2 The IB Diploma curriculum consists of six subject area groups and three core courses. 4 The IB Diploma curriculum offers courses that students can choose in the following six subjects: 5 Studies in language and literature; Language acquisition; Individuals and societies; Sciences; Mathematics; and Arts. Additionally, all students enrolled in the IB Diploma Programme must successfully complete the diploma core which includes the following: 6 Theory of knowledge; The extended essay; and Creativity, activity, service. The IB assessments scores range from 1 to 7 (scores of 4-7 are typically considered passing), with the Theory of Knowledge assessment score scale ranging from A-F. 7 IB diplomas are awarded to students who earn at least 24 points from the course’s corresponding assessment and complete the requirements of the diploma core. International Baccalaureate Program in Florida The IB program is one of a number of articulated acceleration programs, which are intended to shorten the time necessary for a student to earn a high school diploma and a postsecondary degree, broaden the scope of curricular options available, or increase the depth of study available for a particular subject. 8 The law provides the following benefits to schools and students engaged in the IB program: Successful completion of a course examination qualifies for college credit. 9 The percentage of a school’s students eligible to earn college credit favorably affects the school’s grade. 10 A grade earned in IB is assigned additional weight for determining student eligibility for a Bright Futures scholarship. 11 A student who earns an IB Diploma is not required to achieve a score on a college entrance exam to qualify for a Bright Futures scholarship. 12 4 International Baccalaureate, Diploma Programme, https://www.ibo.org/programmes/, (last visited Jan. 3, 2023). 5 Email, Megan Fay, Capital City Consulting, The IB DP Curriculum, (Jan. 2, 2023). 6 Id. 7 Id. 8 Section 1007.27(1), F.S. Accelerated mechanisms include, but are not limited to, dual enrollment and early admission, advanced placement (AP), credit by examination, the International Baccalaureate (IB) Program, and the Advanced International Certificate of Education (AICE) Program. 9 Section 1003.4295, F.S. 10 Section 1008.34(3)(b)2.b., F.S. 11 Section 1009.531(3)(a), F.S. 12 Florida Department of Education, 2021-22 Bright Futures Student Handbook, at 5, https://www.floridastudentfinancialaidsg.org/PDF/BFHandbookChapter1.pdf (last visited Jan.4, 2023). BILL: SB 240 Page 3 Classroom teachers and school districts receive funding incentives based on the performance of each student in IB examinations. 13 For school year 2023-24, the IB diploma curriculum was offered at over 90 school in Florida 14 , with approximately 16,000 students enrolled in IB courses across the state. 15 Since 2020, the number of IB diplomas awarded to students in Florida has increased from 902 to 1,120. 16 Funds for the Operations of Schools – International Baccalaureate Program The Florida Education Finance Program (FEFP) provides a funding incentive for school districts with students in IB courses who successfully complete IB examinations or earn an IB diploma. 17 School districts and schools can earn a value of .16 full-time equivalent student membership within the FEFP for each student enrolled in an IB course who receives a score of 4 or higher on a subject examination. 18 An additional value of 0.3 full-time equivalent student membership is added for each student who receives an IB diploma. 19 Additionally, school districts are required to distribute to each classroom teacher who provided IB instruction: 20 A bonus in the amount of $50 for each student taught by the IB teacher in each IB course who receives a score of 4 or higher on the IB examination. An additional bonus of $500 to each IB teacher in a school designated with a grade of “D” or “F” who has at least one student scoring 4 or higher on the IB examination, regardless of the number of classes taught or of the number of students scoring a 4 or higher on the IB examination. III. Effect of Proposed Changes: SB 240 modifies s. 1011.62, F.S., to authorize the Department of Education (DOE) to determine an equivalent score for certain International Baccalaureate (IB) subject area examinations that are not scored on the traditional 1-7 score scale, like the required Theory of Knowledge course. Courses with equivalent scores determined by the DOE can generate additional full-time equivalent student funding and bonus funding for classroom teachers who provide IB instruction. The bill is effective July 1, 2024. 13 Section 1011.62(1)(1), F.S. 14 Florida Association of IB World Schools, Florida IB Schools: Diploma Programme: All Counties, https://flibs.org/Florida- IB-Schools.cfm?prmProgramme=Diploma, (last visited Jan. 4, 2023). 15 Florida Department of Education, Know Your Schools Portal – State Report Card, https://edudata.fldoe.org/ReportCards/Schools.html?school=0000&district=00, (last visited Jan. 4, 2023). 16 Email, Megan Fay, Capital City Consulting, The IB DP Curriculum, (Jan. 3, 2023). 17 Section 1011.62(1)(l), F.S. 18 Id. 19 Id. 20 Section 1011.62(1)(l) 1.-2., F.S. BILL: SB 240 Page 4 IV. Constitutional Issues: A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: None. B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: None. C. Trust Funds Restrictions: None. D. State Tax or Fee Increases: None. E. Other Constitutional Issues: None. V. Fiscal Impact Statement: A. Tax/Fee Issues: None. B. Private Sector Impact: None. C. Government Sector Impact: This bill could have a fiscal impact on state revenues and expenditures. The bill revises the calculation of the additional full time equivalent membership and certain bonuses based on the International Baccalaureate exam. I. Technical Deficiencies: None. II. Related Issues: None. III. Statutes Affected: This bill substantially amends section 1011.62 of the Florida Statutes. BILL: SB 240 Page 5 IV. Additional Information: A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: (Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) None. B. Amendments: None. This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate.