Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 01/24/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Favorable by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 01/09/24, 4:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Referred to Education Postsecondary; Appropriations Committee on Education; Rules | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Filed |