Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0282 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 30, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024