House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Messages | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 26 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Amendment(s) adopted (869936) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/18/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 12/06/23, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Filed |