Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0298 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 19, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis December 6, 2023
Analysis December 5, 2023