Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 305
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 305
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/10/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|