Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0312 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 30, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024