Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 275
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 275
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS/CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
CS/CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Now in Regulated Industries
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/10/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Regulated Industries; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|