Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0340 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024
Bill January 12, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024