Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 357
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 357
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/30/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/09/24, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|