Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0346 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 7, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 10, 2024