|
05/13/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-166
|
|
|
|
05/10/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/25/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (281177)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 111, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 281177 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Substituted for CS/HB 229
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/24/24, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 12/06/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|