Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0364 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 1, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis December 5, 2023