Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/28/2023 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Filed |