Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0400 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 30, 2024