Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 415
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 415
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 13 NAYS 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 02/08/24, 10:45 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/28/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|