Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0436 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024