Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/13/24, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | CS by Transportation read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/30/24, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/28/2023 | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | Filed |