Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0440 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 31, 2024