Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0446 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 15, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024