Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/23/24, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/10/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 11/28/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Filed |