Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0450 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 21, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024