Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 917
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 917
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 13 NAYS 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Education read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 02/08/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Education Pre-K -12 read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 01/24/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
CS by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 9 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/28/2023
|
Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|