Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0460 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2024
Bill February 12, 2024
Bill January 18, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024