Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died on Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/28/2023 | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Filed |