Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0468 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 15, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024