Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/28/2023
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|