Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0472 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 27, 2024
Bill February 23, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024