|
03/22/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-18
|
|
|
|
03/22/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/19/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/30/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/14/2023
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 12/13/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/28/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|